LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB602
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB602
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB602
Compare Versions
SB602 Chaptered October 2, 2011
SB602 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB602 Amended August 29, 2011
SB602 Amended August 23, 2011
SB602 Amended August 15, 2011
SB602 Amended July 5, 2011
SB602 Amended June 6, 2011
SB602 Amended April 25, 2011
SB602 Amended March 30, 2011
SB602 Amended March 21, 2011
SB602 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB602 Chaptered October 2, 2011
SB602 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB602 Amended August 29, 2011
SB602 Amended August 23, 2011
SB602 Amended August 15, 2011
SB602 Amended July 5, 2011
SB602 Amended June 6, 2011
SB602 Amended April 25, 2011
SB602 Amended March 30, 2011
SB602 Amended March 21, 2011
SB602 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare