|
08/29/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice (Com. on APPR.) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6486.) Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6404.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6264.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2666.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2640.) (January 10).
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 675.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|