California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB616 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Amended

Bill August 27, 2012
Bill August 24, 2012
Bill June 27, 2012
Bill June 26, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012
Bill April 26, 2011
Bill March 22, 2011