LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB616
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB616
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB616
Compare Versions
SB616 Amended August 27, 2012
SB616 Amended August 24, 2012
SB616 Amended June 27, 2012
SB616 Amended June 26, 2012
SB616 Amended January 4, 2012
SB616 Amended April 26, 2011
SB616 Amended March 22, 2011
SB616 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB616 Amended August 27, 2012
SB616 Amended August 24, 2012
SB616 Amended June 27, 2012
SB616 Amended June 26, 2012
SB616 Amended January 4, 2012
SB616 Amended April 26, 2011
SB616 Amended March 22, 2011
SB616 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare