|
09/14/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 326, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4764.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 6146.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1266.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1086.) (May 23).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 848.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|