LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB628
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB628
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB628
Compare Versions
SB628 Chaptered September 14, 2012
SB628 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB628 Amended August 6, 2012
SB628 Amended May 31, 2012
SB628 Amended May 9, 2012
SB628 Amended February 23, 2012
SB628 Amended June 29, 2011
SB628 Amended May 31, 2011
SB628 Amended May 9, 2011
SB628 Amended April 25, 2011
SB628 Amended March 22, 2011
SB628 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB628 Chaptered September 14, 2012
SB628 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB628 Amended August 6, 2012
SB628 Amended May 31, 2012
SB628 Amended May 9, 2012
SB628 Amended February 23, 2012
SB628 Amended June 29, 2011
SB628 Amended May 31, 2011
SB628 Amended May 9, 2011
SB628 Amended April 25, 2011
SB628 Amended March 22, 2011
SB628 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare