California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB628 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill May 31, 2012
Bill May 9, 2012
Bill February 23, 2012
Bill June 29, 2011
Bill May 31, 2011
Bill May 9, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill March 22, 2011