|
07/03/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 50, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3955.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5304.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2723.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2622.) (January 9).
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
Set for hearing January 9.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|