LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB632
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB632
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB632
Compare Versions
SB632 Chaptered July 3, 2012
SB632 Enrolled June 19, 2012
SB632 Amended June 6, 2012
SB632 Amended April 26, 2012
SB632 Amended January 23, 2012
SB632 Amended January 4, 2012
SB632 Amended March 24, 2011
SB632 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB632 Chaptered July 3, 2012
SB632 Enrolled June 19, 2012
SB632 Amended June 6, 2012
SB632 Amended April 26, 2012
SB632 Amended January 23, 2012
SB632 Amended January 4, 2012
SB632 Amended March 24, 2011
SB632 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare