California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB632 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill June 19, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 3, 2012

Amended

Bill June 6, 2012
Bill April 26, 2012
Bill January 23, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012
Bill March 24, 2011