08/22/2011 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2503.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |||
06/27/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/23/2011 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |||
06/15/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
04/28/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
03/29/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
03/29/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 479.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
03/24/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/23/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 453.) (March 23). | |||
03/16/2011 | Set for hearing March 23. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |