California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB644 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill August 29, 2011
Bill August 22, 2011
Bill June 15, 2011