LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB644
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB644
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB644
Compare Versions
SB644 Chaptered October 9, 2011
SB644 Enrolled September 8, 2011
SB644 Amended August 29, 2011
SB644 Amended August 22, 2011
SB644 Amended June 15, 2011
SB644 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB644 Chaptered October 9, 2011
SB644 Enrolled September 8, 2011
SB644 Amended August 29, 2011
SB644 Amended August 22, 2011
SB644 Amended June 15, 2011
SB644 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare