|
08/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 217, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5966.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2722.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2669.) (January 17).
|
|
|
|
01/14/2012
|
Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2649.) (January 10). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2012
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|