California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB663 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/29/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 663CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 217 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 29, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 29, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE JANUARY 26, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 16, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 24, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 12, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 4, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Correa FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to add Section 89.5 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 663, Correa. Veterans: homeless veterans. Under existing law, the Department of Veterans Affairs has specified powers and duties relating to various programs serving veterans, including establishing housing projects. This bill would require the department to include specified information in its strategic plan related to homeless veterans, as provided. This bill would also require the department to transmit the strategic plan to the Chairpersons of the Assembly and Senate Committees on Veterans Affairs. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 89.5 is added to the Military and Veterans Code, to read: 89.5. (a) The department shall include in its strategic plan the following: (1) A review of the goals and objectives relating to homeless veterans, to determine whether the methods the department uses to plan, analyze, develop, monitor, and implement the strategic plan will likely decrease homelessness among veterans. (2) A determination of the number of homeless veterans in this state and the number of those veterans who received benefits from state or federal programs, including, but not limited to, the number of homeless veterans in need of multifamily or transitional housing and the number of those veterans who received benefits for those needs. (b) The department shall transmit the strategic plan to the Chairman of the Senate Committee on Veterans Affairs and the Chairman of the Assembly Committee on Veterans Affairs.