LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB663
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB663
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB663
Compare Versions
SB663 Chaptered August 29, 2012
SB663 Enrolled August 16, 2012
SB663 Amended January 24, 2012
SB663 Amended January 12, 2012
SB663 Amended January 4, 2012
SB663 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB663 Chaptered August 29, 2012
SB663 Enrolled August 16, 2012
SB663 Amended January 24, 2012
SB663 Amended January 12, 2012
SB663 Amended January 4, 2012
SB663 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare