|
09/08/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3036.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 8). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3143.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2821.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 1183.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 761.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|