California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB827 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Amended

Bill September 7, 2011
Bill September 2, 2011
Bill August 26, 2011
Bill May 24, 2011
Bill May 4, 2011
Bill March 25, 2011