LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB827
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB827
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB827
Compare Versions
SB827 Amended September 7, 2011
SB827 Amended September 2, 2011
SB827 Amended August 26, 2011
SB827 Amended May 24, 2011
SB827 Amended May 4, 2011
SB827 Amended March 25, 2011
SB827 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB827 Amended September 7, 2011
SB827 Amended September 2, 2011
SB827 Amended August 26, 2011
SB827 Amended May 24, 2011
SB827 Amended May 4, 2011
SB827 Amended March 25, 2011
SB827 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare