04/26/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2012. | |||
04/26/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
04/17/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |||
04/12/2012 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 3127.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
03/29/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
03/29/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 19. Page 4185.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
03/28/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/27/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (March 27). | |||
03/26/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
02/14/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
02/14/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 168.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
02/10/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/11/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | |||
01/10/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |