California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB83 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2011

Enrolled

Bill April 13, 2012

Chaptered

Bill April 26, 2012

Amended

Bill March 26, 2012
Bill March 14, 2011