BILL NUMBER: SB 83CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 10 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 26, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR APRIL 26, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE APRIL 12, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 14, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review JANUARY 10, 2011 An act to amend the Budget Act of 2011 (Chapter 33 of the Statutes of 2011) by amending Item 0911-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of that act, relating to the support of state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, Budget Bill. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 83, Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review. Budget Act of 2011: Citizens Redistricting Commission. The Budget Act of 2011 appropriates $400,000 for the support of the Citizens Redistricting Commission. The act also authorizes the Director of Finance, not sooner than 30 days after notification to the Joint Legislative Budget Committee, or any lesser time determined by the chairperson of the joint committee, to augment that $400,000 appropriation by up to $1,500,000 if the commission demonstrates that funding for litigation support is necessary. This bill would increase the appropriation for the support of the commission to $739,000. The bill would further authorize the Director of Finance, in addition to the existing augmentation authority and subject to the same time restrictions, to augment that $739,000 appropriation by up to $659,000 if the commission demonstrates that additional funding is necessary during the 2011-12 fiscal year for litigation to defend any action regarding a certified final map and, in addition, by up to $163,000 if the commission demonstrates that additional funding is necessary during the 2011-12 fiscal year for costs related to unemployment insurance and vacation leave balance payments for staff who are terminating employment with the state. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as a Budget Bill. Appropriation: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Item 0911-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2011 is amended to read: 0911-001-0001--For support of the Citizens Redistricting Initiative....................... 739,000 Provisions: 1. The Director of Finance, not sooner than 30 days after notification to the Joint Legislative Budget Committee, or any lesser time determined by the chairperson of the joint committee, may augment this item by up to $1,500,000 if the Citizens Redistricting Commission demonstrates that funding for litigation support is necessary. 2. In addition to the authority provided in Provision 1, the Director of Finance, not sooner than 30 days after notification to the Joint Legislative Budget Committee, or any lesser time determined by the chairperson of the joint committee, may augment this item by up to $659,000 if the Citizens Redistricting Commission demonstrates that additional funding is necessary during the 2011-12 fiscal year for litigation to defend any action regarding a certified final map. 3. In addition to the authority provided in Provisions 1 and 2, the Director of Finance, not sooner than 30 days after notification to the Joint Legislative Budget Committee, or any lesser time determined by the chairperson of the joint committee, may augment this item by up to $163,000 if the Citizens Redistricting Commission demonstrates that additional funding is necessary during the 2011-12 fiscal year for costs related to unemployment insurance and vacation leave balance payments for staff who are terminating employment with the state. SEC. 2. This act is a Budget Bill within the meaning of subdivision (e) of Section 12 of Article IV of the California Constitution and shall take effect immediately.