|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 2236.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 2685.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2573.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1033.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 620.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|