BILL NUMBER: SB 834ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 30, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 25, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 29, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 21, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 4, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 13, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wolk (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Huffman) (Coauthor: Senator Hancock) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Bonilla, Buchanan, and Galgiani) FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to amend Section 10540 of the Water Code, relating to water. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 834, Wolk. Integrated regional water management plans: contents. The Integrated Regional Water Management Planning Act of 2002 authorizes a regional water management group, as defined, to prepare and adopt an integrated regional water management plan. The act requires an integrated regional water management plan to address specified water quality and water supply matters. This bill would additionally require an integrated regional water management plan to identify the manner in which the plan furthers a specified state policy concerning reducing reliance on the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta for water supply and improving regional self-reliance for water, if the region depends on water from the Delta watershed. The bill would require integrated regional water management plans to incorporate that requirement when they are developed, updated, or amended in accordance with guidelines established by the Department of Water Resources. For an application for funding for a plan that is made prior to an update or amendment of the plan, the bill would require an applicant to specify how the existing plan advances the specified state policy concerning reducing reliance on the Delta for water supply and improving regional self-reliance for water. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (a) The Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta is a critically important natural resource for California and the nation. (b) In 2009, the Legislature adopted Section 85054 of the Water Code to define "coequal goals" as the two goals of providing a more reliable water supply for California and protecting, restoring, and enhancing the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta ecosystem. That section states that the coequal goals shall be achieved in a manner that protects and enhances the unique cultural, recreational, natural resource, and agricultural values of the Delta as an evolving place. (c) The Legislature also adopted Section 85020 of the Water Code, which sets forth the policy of the state regarding achieving specified objectives that are inherent in the coequal goals. (d) Furthermore, Section 85021 of the Water Code provides that it is the policy of the state to reduce reliance on the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta in meeting California's future water supply needs through a statewide strategy of investing in improved regional supplies, conservation, and water use efficiency. (e) Integrated regional water management plans provide a mechanism for advancing the policies stated in Sections 85020 and 85021 of the Water Code. (f) Subdivision (a) of Section 85031 of the Water Code ensures that no provision of the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta Reform Act of 2009, including Section 85021, diminishes, impairs, or otherwise affects water rights protections provided under the law. SEC. 2. Section 10540 of the Water Code is amended to read: 10540. (a) A regional water management group may prepare and adopt an integrated regional water management plan in accordance with this part. (b) A regional water management group may coordinate its planning activities to address or incorporate all or part of any of the following actions of its members into its plan: (1) Groundwater management planning pursuant to Part 2.75 (commencing with Section 10750) or other specific groundwater management authority. (2) Urban water management planning pursuant to Part 2.6 (commencing with Section 10610). (3) The preparation of a water supply assessment required pursuant to Part 2.10 (commencing with Section 10910). (4) Agricultural water management planning pursuant to Part 2.8 (commencing with Section 10800). (5) City and county general planning pursuant to Section 65350 of the Government Code. (6) Stormwater resource planning that is undertaken pursuant to Part 2.3 (commencing with Section 10560). (7) Other water resource management planning, including flood protection, watershed management planning, and multipurpose program planning. (c) At a minimum, all plans shall address all of the following: (1) Protection and improvement of water supply reliability, including identification of feasible agricultural and urban water use efficiency strategies. (2) Identification and consideration of the drinking water quality of communities within the area of the plan. (3) Protection and improvement of water quality within the area of the plan, consistent with the relevant basin plan. (4) Identification of any significant threats to groundwater resources from overdrafting. (5) Protection, restoration, and improvement of stewardship of aquatic, riparian, and watershed resources within the region. (6) Protection of groundwater resources from contamination. (7) Identification and consideration of the water-related needs of disadvantaged communities in the area within the boundaries of the plan. (8) For a region that depends on water from the Delta watershed, as defined in Section 85060, identification of the manner in which the plan furthers the statewide policy in Section 85021, utilizing any of the following: (A) Water use efficiency. (B) Water recycling. (C) Advanced water technologies. (D) Local and regional water supply projects. (E) Improved regional coordination of local and regional water supply projects. (d) (1) When plans are developed, updated, or amended in accordance with department guidelines consistent with subdivision (i) of Section 10541, the plans shall incorporate the requirements of paragraph (8) of subdivision (c). (2) On and after January 1, 2012, an applicant for funding for a plan that applies prior to an update or amendment to the plan shall specify how the existing plan advances the policy stated in Section 85021. (e) This section does not obligate a local agency to fund the implementation of any project or program.