LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB834
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB834
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB834
Compare Versions
SB834 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB834 Amended August 25, 2011
SB834 Amended June 29, 2011
SB834 Amended June 21, 2011
SB834 Amended May 4, 2011
SB834 Amended April 13, 2011
SB834 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB834 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB834 Amended August 25, 2011
SB834 Amended June 29, 2011
SB834 Amended June 21, 2011
SB834 Amended May 4, 2011
SB834 Amended April 13, 2011
SB834 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare