|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 828, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 4580.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 34. Page 5975.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5557.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 3681.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (September 7).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2940.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 44. Noes 28. Page 2864.) Read third time and amended. (Ayes 37. Noes 30. Page 2865.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Motion to reconsider continued to September 2.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 36. Noes 36. Page 2600.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Cedillo.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 6.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 1229.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1111.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 543.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|