California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB9 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill July 2, 2012
Bill February 2, 2012
Bill September 6, 2011
Bill September 2, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011