LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB9
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB9
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB9
Compare Versions
SB9 Chaptered September 30, 2012
SB9 Enrolled August 21, 2012
SB9 Amended July 2, 2012
SB9 Amended February 2, 2012
SB9 Amended September 6, 2011
SB9 Amended September 2, 2011
SB9 Amended August 15, 2011
SB9 Amended May 27, 2011
SB9 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB9 Chaptered September 30, 2012
SB9 Enrolled August 21, 2012
SB9 Amended July 2, 2012
SB9 Amended February 2, 2012
SB9 Amended September 6, 2011
SB9 Amended September 2, 2011
SB9 Amended August 15, 2011
SB9 Amended May 27, 2011
SB9 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare