|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 737, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 5107.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 31). Read second time. Amended. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6762.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6762.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 6705.) Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6706.)
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
Motion to reconsider continued.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 3165.) Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 24. Noes 33. Page 3242.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Solorio.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 3110.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 3002.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1266.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1123.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 766.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|