LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB923
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB923
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB923
Compare Versions
SB923 Chaptered September 28, 2012
SB923 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB923 Amended August 31, 2012
SB923 Amended September 8, 2011
SB923 Amended September 7, 2011
SB923 Amended August 30, 2011
SB923 Amended May 31, 2011
SB923 Amended May 3, 2011
SB923 Amended April 11, 2011
SB923 Amended March 24, 2011
SB923 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB923 Chaptered September 28, 2012
SB923 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB923 Amended August 31, 2012
SB923 Amended September 8, 2011
SB923 Amended September 7, 2011
SB923 Amended August 30, 2011
SB923 Amended May 31, 2011
SB923 Amended May 3, 2011
SB923 Amended April 11, 2011
SB923 Amended March 24, 2011
SB923 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare