California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB923 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2012

Amended

Bill August 31, 2012
Bill September 8, 2011
Bill September 7, 2011
Bill August 30, 2011
Bill May 31, 2011
Bill May 3, 2011
Bill April 11, 2011
Bill March 24, 2011