|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 669, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4766.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6128.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3751.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3589.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3259.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3119.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|