California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB978 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 20, 2012
Bill June 18, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill May 15, 2012
Bill April 19, 2012
Bill March 15, 2012
Bill February 23, 2012