LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB978
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB978
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB978
Compare Versions
SB978 Chaptered September 27, 2012
SB978 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB978 Amended August 20, 2012
SB978 Amended June 18, 2012
SB978 Amended May 25, 2012
SB978 Amended May 15, 2012
SB978 Amended April 19, 2012
SB978 Amended March 15, 2012
SB978 Amended February 23, 2012
SB978 Introduced January 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB978 Chaptered September 27, 2012
SB978 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB978 Amended August 20, 2012
SB978 Amended June 18, 2012
SB978 Amended May 25, 2012
SB978 Amended May 15, 2012
SB978 Amended April 19, 2012
SB978 Amended March 15, 2012
SB978 Amended February 23, 2012
SB978 Introduced January 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare