|
09/17/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 356, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4761.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6064.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3750.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3589.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3205.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|