LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB979
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB979
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB979
Compare Versions
SB979 Chaptered September 17, 2012
SB979 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB979 Amended July 5, 2012
SB979 Amended May 1, 2012
SB979 Amended April 9, 2012
SB979 Introduced January 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB979 Chaptered September 17, 2012
SB979 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB979 Amended July 5, 2012
SB979 Amended May 1, 2012
SB979 Amended April 9, 2012
SB979 Introduced January 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare