California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB979 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2012

Amended

Bill July 5, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012