08/10/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2012. | |||
08/10/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
08/09/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/09/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5848.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/06/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 6). | |||
05/03/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/26/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
04/26/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3292.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/09/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |