California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR63 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 9, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 10, 2012

Amended

Bill April 9, 2012
Bill March 5, 2012