LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR63
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR63
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR63
Compare Versions
SCR63 Chaptered August 10, 2012
SCR63 Enrolled August 9, 2012
SCR63 Amended April 9, 2012
SCR63 Amended March 5, 2012
SCR63 Introduced February 9, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SCR63 Chaptered August 10, 2012
SCR63 Enrolled August 9, 2012
SCR63 Amended April 9, 2012
SCR63 Amended March 5, 2012
SCR63 Introduced February 9, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare