08/24/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2012. | |||
08/24/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. | |||
08/21/2012 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 4634.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/14/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
08/13/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 5897.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/09/2012 | Read third time and amended. (Page 5842.) Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/28/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (June 28). | |||
06/19/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/25/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/14/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/14/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 3490.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/09/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/16/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |