LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR84
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR84
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR84
Compare Versions
SCR84 Chaptered August 24, 2012
SCR84 Enrolled August 22, 2012
SCR84 Amended August 9, 2012
SCR84 Amended June 19, 2012
SCR84 Amended May 3, 2012
SCR84 Introduced April 16, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SCR84 Chaptered August 24, 2012
SCR84 Enrolled August 22, 2012
SCR84 Amended August 9, 2012
SCR84 Amended June 19, 2012
SCR84 Amended May 3, 2012
SCR84 Introduced April 16, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare