California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR84 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 16, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 24, 2012

Amended

Bill August 9, 2012
Bill June 19, 2012
Bill May 3, 2012