|
09/10/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 117, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5014.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 52. Noes 17. Page 6576.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6255.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the resolution was read, adopted, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6139.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5866.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4317.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2012
|
Set for hearing July 2.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4014.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Set for hearing June 19.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|