LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR93
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR93
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR93
Compare Versions
SCR93 Chaptered September 10, 2012
SCR93 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SCR93 Amended August 24, 2012
SCR93 Amended August 15, 2012
SCR93 Introduced May 31, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SCR93 Chaptered September 10, 2012
SCR93 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SCR93 Amended August 24, 2012
SCR93 Amended August 15, 2012
SCR93 Introduced May 31, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare