California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR93 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 31, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 10, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 15, 2012