|
03/06/2014
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2013
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 8. Page 2927.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2102.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 6. Page 1465.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|