LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1113
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1113
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1113
Compare Versions
AB1113 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB1113 Amended August 13, 2013
AB1113 Amended June 18, 2013
AB1113 Amended April 16, 2013
AB1113 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB1113 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB1113 Amended August 13, 2013
AB1113 Amended June 18, 2013
AB1113 Amended April 16, 2013
AB1113 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare