California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1113 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Amended

Bill August 13, 2013
Bill June 18, 2013
Bill April 16, 2013