|
09/28/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 411, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3116.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2230.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1701.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|